judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER COPTY LUFTIG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0101)
Case Number:S-09-0101Case Docketed On:05/15/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER COPTY LUFTIG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER COPTY LUFTIG, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher Copty LuftigGalen Bruce Woelk
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 43
Citation:228 P.3d 857 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/15/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/15/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/29/2009Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
07/02/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's brief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/13/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/24/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/25/2009Motion - Strike - reply brief of appellant.MotionStrikeFinal
08/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/28/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Galen Woelk for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/29/2009Order - Deny Motion to Strike Reply BriefOrderDenyFinal
10/20/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Galen Woelk for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/15/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/03/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/03/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/05/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/4/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal