judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SPECIALTY HOSPITAL OF WASHINGTON V. HEALTH CARE FINANCE

Case Information: 11-AA-0049
Short Caption:SPECIALTY HOSPITAL OF WASHINGTON V. HEALTH CARE FINANCEClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Not SpecifiedFiled Date:01/21/2011

Opening Event Date:01/21/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerSpecialty Hospital of Washington Capitol HillN
A. Scott BoldenNN
RespondentDC Department of Health Care FinanceN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/21/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
01/21/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
01/24/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
02/02/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER for lack of jurisdiction since the letter attached to the petition DOES NOT APPEAR TO BE FROM A CONTESTED CASE...OR for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. (BY: ETW)
02/18/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
02/28/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO WITHDRAW IS GRANTED and this appeal is hereby DISMISSED. See DC App. R. 13 (b). (BY: ETW)
02/28/2011DISMISSED
03/22/2011MANDATE ISSUED