judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LATASHA M. BOYER-GLADDEN v. DEPUTY SHERIFF BILL HILL, and DANNY GLICK, Sheriff of Laramie County Wyoming in his Official Capacity

Case Heading (S-09-0102)
Case Number:S-09-0102Case Docketed On:05/18/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:LATASHA M. BOYER-GLADDEN v. DEPUTY SHERIFF BILL HILL, and DANNY GLICK, Sheriff of Laramie County Wyoming in his Official Capacity
Full Title:LATASHA M. BOYER-GLADDEN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DEPUTY SHERIFF BILL HILL, and DANNY GLICK, Sheriff of Laramie County Wyoming in his Official Capacity, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLatasha M. Boyer-GladdenBernard Q. Phelan
AppelleeBill HillKay Lynn Bestol
AppelleeDanny GlickNancy D. Freudenthal
Jon Mark Stewart
Bruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Theodore R. Racines

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Rights, Governmental Claims, Immunity, Limitation of Actions
Opinion Number:2010 WY 12
Citation:224 P.3d 21

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/18/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/18/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/06/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/23/2009Brief - Appellee - Danny Glick in his official capacity.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee Danny Glick Sheriff of Laramie County Wyoming in his official capacityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/27/2009Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion for January 16, 2008 transcriptRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
08/10/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee Danny Glick for state law claims.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/20/2009Brief - Appellee - Danny Glick for state law claimsBriefAppelleeFinal
08/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received- Brief of Appellee Danny Glick on State Law ClaimsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/21/2009Brief - Appellee Bill HillBriefAppelleeFinal
08/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Bill HillEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2009Brief - Appellant reply to Appellee Hill.BriefAppellant replyFinal
09/09/2009Motion - Correct a Document (to amend brief of appellant).MotionCorrect a DocumentFinal
09/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's second reply brief (Appellee Hill)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to amend opening briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/16/2009Response/Objection - Motion to amend appellant's briefResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Defendant Hill's response to plaintiff's motion to amend opening brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/17/2009Motion - Strike - Appellant's second reply briefMotionStrikeFinal
09/17/2009Memorandum - In support of motionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
09/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to strike appellant's second reply brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Memorandum in opposition to appellant's motion to amend opening brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/18/2009Motion - StrikeMotionStrikeFinal
09/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Strike Appellee's Second Reply Brief (Second Brief of Appellee)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Nancy Freudenthal for Sheriff Glick in his official capacity.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bernard Phelan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Theodore R. Racines for appellee Glick.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/24/2009Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/24/2009Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Memorandum in Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike Appellee's Second Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Response and Objection to Appellant's Motion to Strike Appellee's "Second Reply Brief" by Danny Glick, Sheriff of Laramie County Wyoming in His Official CapacityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kay Lynn Bestol for appellee Hill.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/06/2009Order - Other - Granting Motion to Amend Opening Brief, Order Granting, In Part, Motion to Strike Second Reply Brief, and Order Denying Motion to Strike Appellee's Second BriefOrderOtherFinal
10/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bernard Q. Phelan for appellant; Theodore R. Racines, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Kay Lynn Bestol and Nancy D. Freudenthal for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/03/2009Event - Phone Call - Called clerk of district court to request additional pages of record not designated per request of Court.EventPhone CallFinal
12/04/2009Record - Supplemental record on appeal. One volume, original papers, labeled as Volume IV.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
12/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
02/09/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court. Justice Kite filed a specially concurring opinion in which Justice Burke joined.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/25/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/02/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/1/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal