judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEIBOWITZ VS. LEIBOWITZ

Case Information: 38324
Short Caption:LEIBOWITZ VS. LEIBOWITZCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39683
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D249196Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/23/2001 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Dickerson, Dickerson, Consul & Pocker--check no. 6781.
08/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13946
08/23/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/04/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 01-14921
09/04/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Ecker & Standish, Chartered--check no. 34718.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 01-14925
09/04/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Parties are advised to notify this court immediately if a change of designation of parties is desired.
09/06/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
09/12/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
09/21/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 01-15944
09/24/2001Other Other. Mailed additional documents to Settlement Judge Lansford W. Levitt.
11/09/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-18752
11/21/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal and cross-appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant shall each have 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Because this is a child custody matter, appellant/cross-respondent shall have 90 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix on appeal. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 20 days thereafter to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 10 days thereafter to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 10 days thereafter to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(2); NRAP 28(h) and (c). 01-19606
12/07/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). 01-20598
12/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/13/00; 9/15/00; 12/21/00; 2/2/01; 2/7/01; and 7/10/01. To Court Reporter: Family Court Transcript Services. 01-20642
12/13/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Remand. 01-20991
12/31/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Deena Cooperman's Opposition to Steven Leibowitz' Motion to Remand. 01-21871
01/14/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-00971
02/15/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant Deena Cooperman's Opening Brief (First Request). 02-03026
03/01/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 14, 2002, Transcript/Video Services filed a motion requesting an extension of time to March 9, 2002 to file and serve the requested transcripts. We grant the motion. Because March 9, 2002, is not a court business day, however, Transcript/Video Services shall prepare and file the requested transcripts by March 11, 2002. On February 15, 2002, appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Cause appearing, we grant the motion. Accordingly, appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by April 22, 2002. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(2). 02-03771
03/11/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/13/00; 09/15/00; 12/21/00; 02/02/01; 02/07/01; and 07/10/01. Court Reporter: Shelly A. Ajoub. 02-04361
04/22/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Suspension of Briefing Schedule; or in the alternative Motion for an Extension of time to file Appellant Deena Cooperman's Opening Brief. 02-07028
04/30/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Appellant's Motion for Suspension of Briefing Schedule. 02-07626
05/06/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --transcripts were mailed to counsel for respondent on April 24, 2002. 02-07882
05/16/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Robert Eisenberg regarding Motion to Remand filed December 13, 2001. 02-08654
05/20/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Supplemental Response to Appellant's Motion for Suspension of Briefing Schedule. 02-08899
06/21/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On April 22, 2002, appellant/cross-respondent (appellant) filed a motion requesting a suspension of the briefing schedule to provide appellant an opportunity to obtain new counsel to represent her in this appeal. On April 30, 2002, respondent/cross-appellant (respondent) filed an opposition to appellant's motion. On May 20, 2002, respondent filed a supplement to his opposition and indicates that 'the district court ruled on the disqualification, and the district court determined that appellant's counsel is not disqualified.' We deny appellant's motion to suspend the briefing schedule. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from service of the opening brief to file a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant shall have 10 days from service of respondent's combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal to file a combined answering brief on cross-appeal and reply brief on appeal. Respondent shall have 10 days from service of appellant's combined answering brief on cross-appeal and reply brief on appeal to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if any. NRAP 28(c) and NRAP 31(a)(2). 02-10749
08/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant/cross-respondent (appellant) has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the required documents or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Respondent/cross-appellant (respondent) shall have 20 days from service of the opening brief to file a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant shall have 10 days from service or respondent's combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal to file a combined answering brief on cross-appeal and reply brief on appeal. Respondent shall have 10 days from service of appellant's combined answering brief on cross-appeal and reply brief on appeal to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. NRAP 31(a)(2). 02-13815
08/30/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal, for Failure to Comply with Supreme Court Order; Notice of Dismissal of Cross-Appeal; Request for Expedited Consideration. 02-15107
09/16/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Motion to Dismiss Apeal for Failure to Comply with Supreme Court Orders; Notice of Dismissal of Cross-Appeal; Request for Expedited Consideration; and Belated Response to this Court's Orders. 02-16055
11/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Because it appears that the parties may have settled this appeal and cross-appeal, we deny respondent's motion to dismiss. The parties shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation to dismiss this appeal and cross-appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of their appeals. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal and cross-appeal as abandoned. fn1[We defer ruling on respondent's December 13, 2001, motion to remand pending further order of this court.] 02-19298
12/02/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Order of November 8, 2002. 02-20557
01/08/2003Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Robert L. Eisenberg regarding the status of this case. 03-00409
03/04/2003MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Second Motion to Dismiss Appeal, Based Upon Appellant's Failure to Comply with Multiple Supreme Court Orders. 03-03582
04/02/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Submission of Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 03-05561
04/17/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. And Order to Show Cause. We grant respondent's motions and ' . . . dismiss appellant's appeal and also dismiss respondent's cross-appeal.' fn1[We deny, as moot, respondent's April 2, 2003, request for submission of his March 4, 2003, motion.] Because it appears that appellant may have taken this appeal solely for the purpose of delay, appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this court should not award respondent attorney fees pursuant to NRAP 38(b). fn2[We deny, as moot, respondent's December 13, 2001, motion to remand.] NNP03-RR/WM/MG 03-06532
05/12/2003MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 03-08032
05/13/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-06759
05/13/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/19/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 16, 2003. 03-06759
05/23/2003MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Permission to File Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. 03-08800
12/19/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 17, 2003, this court entered an order dismissing this appeal and cross-appeal and directing appellant/cross-respondent ('appellant') to show cause why this court should not award respondent/cross-appellant ('respondent') attorney fees pursuant to NRAP 38. Appellant has filed a response to the April 17, 2003, order. Respondent has filed a motion requesting leave to file a reply to appellant's response. Cause appearing, we grant the motion to file a reply. The clerk shall file the reply received on May 23, 2003. Having reviewed the response and reply, we conclude that the imposition of sanctions pursuant to NRAP 38 is not warranted. 03-21167
12/19/2003MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. 03-08801