judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF WAXAHACHIE, TEXAS v. MILTON WATKINS, ET AL.

Case: A-4647
A-4647
04/19/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF WAXAHACHIE, TEXAS
MILTON WATKINS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/02/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/06/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/06/1954Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
04/29/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/1955Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
02/09/1955Response to Motion filed
02/02/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/19/1955Opinion issued
10/06/1954Brief on the Merits
10/06/1954Brief on the Merits
07/07/1954Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/29/1954Response to Petition
04/22/1954Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
04/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Waxahachie, TexasPetitioner
Milton Watkins, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information