judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-83-00070-CR
13-83-00070-CR
01/01/1981
Other Felony
Style1
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/1984Mandate Issued
06/06/1984Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused
04/26/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/26/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
01/12/1984Petition for Review
12/15/1983Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
10/13/1983Submitted
09/13/1983Submission
09/01/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/20/1983Brief Filed
07/05/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/27/1983Brief Filed
06/27/1983Applicant's (Crim) Brief Received
05/26/1983record
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Vernon Harville