judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-82-00384-CV
13-82-00384-CV
01/01/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Style1
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/25/1984Mandate Issued
04/30/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
04/30/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
04/30/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
10/13/1983Submitted
09/01/1983Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/12/1983Motion to Reset submission
08/04/1983Submission
04/26/1983Brief Filed
04/14/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/31/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/11/1983Brief Filed
02/09/1983Exhibits Filed
02/09/1983Statement of Facts Filed
12/30/1982Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp
12/09/1982Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/09/1982Statement of Facts Filed
12/09/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/25/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Marion M Lewis