judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6513
B-6513
01/20/1977
MISC PETITION
IMPERIAL AMERICAN RESOURCES FUND, INC.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, BTA OIL PRODUCERS, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS AND BTA OIL PRODUCERS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/02/1977Response to Brief filed
03/31/1977Appellees' Brief filed
03/31/1977Brief on the Merits
02/22/1977Appellant's Brief filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/27/1977Opinion issued
08/01/1977Letter Filed
05/11/1977Motion to Substitute filed
05/11/1977Motion for leave to file post submission brief
05/02/1977Response to Brief filed
03/31/1977Appellees' Brief filed
03/31/1977Brief on the Merits
03/09/1977Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
02/22/1977Appellant's Brief filed
01/20/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/20/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/20/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Imperial American Resources Fund, Inc.Appellant
Railroad Commission of Texas and BTA Oil ProducersAppellee
Railroad Commission of TexasAppellee
BTA Oil ProducersAppellee
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information