judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6531
B-6531
01/28/1977
Application for Writ of Error
LOWER COLORADO RIVER AUTHORITY
LO-VACA GATHERING COMPANY AND COASTAL STATES GAS PRODUCING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/06/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/27/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/19/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/19/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/27/1977Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
03/18/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/14/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
01/28/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/06/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/27/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/24/1977Response to Motion filed
05/19/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/19/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/04/1977Opinion issued
04/27/1977Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
03/18/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/14/1977Response to Petition
01/28/1977Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/28/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John L. Hill, Attorney General of TexasAmicus Curiae
Lower Colorado River AuthorityPetitioner
City of AustinAmicus Curiae
Lo-Vaca Gathering Company and Coastal States Gas Producing CompanyRespondent
City of San Antonio by and through City Public Service Board of San AntonioAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information