judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. S. PAXTON, ET UX. v. V. L. WARE

Case: A-4657
A-4657
04/14/1954
Application for Writ of Error
J. S. PAXTON, ET UX.
V. L. WARE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/08/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/23/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/08/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/18/1954Response to Motion filed
05/03/1954Motion to dismiss
04/26/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/23/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/14/1954Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
V. L. WareRespondent
J. S. Paxton, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information