judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WESTERN MUNICIPAL CONSTRUCTION OF WYOMING, INC. v. BETTER LIVING, LLC

Case Heading (S-09-0116)
Case Number:S-09-0116Case Docketed On:06/17/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:WESTERN MUNICIPAL CONSTRUCTION OF WYOMING, INC. v. BETTER LIVING, LLC
Full Title:WESTERN MUNICIPAL CONSTRUCTION OF WYOMING, INC., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BETTER LIVING, LLC, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWestern Municipal Construction of Wyoming, Inc.Raymond W. Martin
Kristin M. Nuss
AppelleeBetter Living, LLCAnthony Todd Wendtland

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2010 WY 92
Citation:234 P.3d 1223

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/17/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA with attachments receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
06/17/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appeal received without attachmentsOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
06/17/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/23/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
07/28/2009Brief - Appellant, with statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
07/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant Western Municipal Construction of Wyoming, Inc.; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
09/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Better Living, LLC and Appellees' Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Western Municipal Construction of Wyoming, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/22/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers, Volume II, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Anthony Wendtland for apellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/25/2009Order - Oral argument rescheduled - moved from October 21, 2009 to October 22, 2009OrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Raymond Martin for apellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Raymond W. Martin for appellant; Anthony T. Wendtland for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/29/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/15/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/15/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/16/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal