judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEDINA-AGUILA (EVERARDO) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 38337
Short Caption:MEDINA-AGUILA (EVERARDO) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR96P1302AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14034
09/12/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15450
09/12/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-15451
10/02/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16572
10/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML 01-17155
11/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-17347
11/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2001. 01-17347