judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9969
B-9969
12/12/1980
Application for Writ of Error
GEORGE SAMANO, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF RODOLFO B. SAMANO, DECEASED, JUAN S. GARZA AND WIFE, ENEDINA F.GARZA, ET AL.
SUN OIL COMPANY AND TANA OIL AND GAS CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/05/1981Errata Filed
10/01/1981Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/13/1981Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/04/1981Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/17/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
12/12/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/05/1981Errata Filed
10/05/1981Response to Motion filed
10/01/1981Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/16/1981Dissenting opinion issued.
09/16/1981Opinion issued
03/13/1981Response to Brief filed
03/04/1981Brief on the Merits
03/04/1981Motion for leave to file post submission brief
01/21/1981Document received (See Remarks)
12/17/1980Response to Petition
12/12/1980Document received (See Remarks)
12/12/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
George Samano, individually and as Independent Executor of the Estate of Rodolfo B. Samano, deceased, Juan S. Garza and wife, Enedina F.Garza, et al.Petitioner
Sun Oil Company and Tana Oil and Gas CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information