judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JOSEPH CURRY v. J. DAVID CURRY, ET AL.

Case: A-4648
A-4648
04/19/1954
Application for Writ of Error
JOSEPH CURRY
J. DAVID CURRY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/12/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/09/1954Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
04/28/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/21/1954Opinion issued
06/12/1954Brief on the Merits
06/09/1954Brief on the Merits
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/28/1954Response to Petition
04/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. David Curry, et al.Respondent
Joseph CurryPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information