judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MALLORY E. SIMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1635
Short Caption:MALLORY E. SIMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-17830-09Filed Date:08/05/2010

Opening Event Date:08/05/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/05/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/13/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMallory E. Simpson Y
Frederick A. DouglasNY
Alex ChintellaNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Sean M. Lewis YN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX
01/26/2011RECORD COPIES
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 ( pleadings filed in superior court) sealed yellow envelope
01/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Michael L. Spekter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Michael L. Spekter, Esquire
02/10/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
04/14/2011MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Atty Michael McDonald Granted
04/29/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, and the appointment of Michael Spekter, Esquire, is hereby vacated. Michael Spekter, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appeared counsel forthwith. F/O that the motion of Frederick A. Douglas, Esquire, is granted and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Michael P. McDonald, Esquire, pro hac vice on behalf of appellant. (ETW)
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (25 pgs/Swaringer) 4/12/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (217 pgs/White) 4/13/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (217 pgs/Swaringer) 4/14/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (192 pgs/White) 4/15/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (194 pgs/Van Bremen) 4/19/10 proc.
05/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (11 pgs/Van Bremen) 4/20/10 proc. w/cd
05/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on August 9, 2011.
08/09/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/09/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for one-day (Appellee)
09/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File reply brief Reply Brief (Appellant)
10/05/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time.
10/05/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/10/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file reply brief to 12/9/11.
12/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief - until January 9, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
12/14/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Appellant)Denied
01/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/02/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant) (Supplemental Appendix attached (pii))
02/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the reply brief, and holding the APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY IN ABEYANCE.
05/01/2012FiledStatus Report regarding pending 23-110 (Appellant)
05/08/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion to stay appeal.
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
07/26/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw and substitute other counsel (Appellant)Granted
07/31/2012FiledOrder Granting motion to withdraw appearance of Michael P. McDonald, Esquire and entering the appearnce of Alex M. Chintella, Esquire.
09/13/2012FiledSubmitted To Judge Beckwith,Oberly,Terry
12/18/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Terry, Senior Judge.)
01/09/2013FiledMandate