judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITTLESEA BLUE CAB VS. TAXICAB AUTHORITY

Case Information: 38325
Short Caption:WHITTLESEA BLUE CAB VS. TAXICAB AUTHORITYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A435304Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:ShearingCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/23/2001 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Shearing. Law firm of Gordon & Silver.
08/16/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Gordon & Silver, Ltd.--check no. 18652.
08/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13953
08/23/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/31/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (all appellants) 01-14768
09/05/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
09/07/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Response to Appellants' Statement of Issues on Appeal. 01-15159
12/10/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of from Further Participation by ACE Cab Co.; ABC Union Cab Co.; A-NLV Cab Company, Inc. and Vegas-Western Cab Co. 01-20696
12/14/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
12/17/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal from Further Participation by Whittlesea Blue Cab and Henderson Taxi. 01-21215
12/19/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lansford W. Levitt.
02/14/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 02-02981
02/14/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 02-02982
03/04/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On February 14, 2002, the parties filed a motion to voluntarily withdraw this appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted and " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 02-03834
03/04/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.