judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. BUILDING CODE BOARD OF APPEALS of the CITY OF CHEYENNE

Case Heading (S-09-0103)
Case Number:S-09-0103Case Docketed On:05/18/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. BUILDING CODE BOARD OF APPEALS of the CITY OF CHEYENNE
Full Title:CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BUILDING CODE BOARD OF APPEALS of the CITY OF CHEYENNE, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCheyenne Newspapers, Inc., a Wyoming corporationBruce T. Moats
AppelleeBuilding Code Board of Appeals of the City of CheyenneCatherine M. Fox

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure
Opinion Number:2010 WY 2
Citation:222 P.3d 158

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/18/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/18/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/25/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/12/2009Brief - Appellee; and statement of costsBriefAppelleeFinal
08/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Building Code Board of Appeals of the City of Cheyenne; and Statement of Costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/24/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of Appellant Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/02/2009Notice-Incoming - No designation of record filed by either counselNotice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
09/02/2009Order - Sanction - designation of record (both counsel sanctioned)OrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
09/08/2009Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
09/09/2009Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
09/10/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bruce Moats for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kate Fox for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bruce T. Moats for appellant; Catherine M. Fox for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/08/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court, Justice Kite filed a specially concurring opinion in which Justice Hill joins, Justice Burke filed a concurring in part and dissenting part opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/26/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/26/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/28/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/27/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal