judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9992
B-9992
12/22/1980
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS, MATAGORDA COUNTY, TEXAS, ET AL., PALACIOS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
CITY OF AUSTIN, CENTRAL POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, CITY OF SAN ANTONIO, HOUSTON LIGHTING POWER COMPANY AND TEXAS COMMERCE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/13/1981Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/11/1981Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/08/1981Response to PetitionRespondent
01/06/1981Response to PetitionRespondent
01/05/1981Response to PetitionRespondent
01/02/1981Response to PetitionRespondent
12/22/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
12/22/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/19/1981Response to Motion filed
02/18/1981Response to Motion filed
02/17/1981Response to Motion filed
02/17/1981Response to Motion filed
02/16/1981Response to Motion filed
02/13/1981Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/11/1981Motion for Rehearing
01/08/1981Response to Petition
01/06/1981Response to Petition
01/05/1981Response to Petition
01/02/1981Response to Petition
12/22/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/22/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/22/1980Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of AustinRespondent
Central Power and Light CompanyRespondent
Houston Lighting Power Company and Texas Commerce Bank National AssociationRespondent
State of Texas, Matagorda County, Texas, et al.Petitioner
City of San Antonio by and through City Public Service Board of San AntonioRespondent
Palacios Independent School DistrictPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information