judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9942
B-9942
12/02/1980
Application for Writ of Error
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION OF TEXAS
TARRANT UTILITY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/12/1981Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/17/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
12/02/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/19/1981Notice of Appearance
02/17/1981Response to Motion filed
02/12/1981Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/17/1980Response to Petition
12/02/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/02/1980Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Public Utility Commission of TexasPetitioner
Tarrant Utility CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information