judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9951
B-9951
12/03/1980
Application for Writ of Error
B. GILL CLEMENTS AND WIFE, PATRICIA L. CLEMENTS
MATALEE WEBSTER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/04/1981Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/29/1981Response to PetitionRespondent
01/14/1981Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
12/15/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
12/03/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/09/1981Response to Motion filed
03/04/1981Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/29/1981Response to Petition
01/14/1981Supplement to Petition filed
12/15/1980Response to Petition
12/03/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/03/1980Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Matalee WebsterRespondent
B. Gill Clements and wife, Patricia L. ClementsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information