judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9952
B-9952
12/03/1980
Application for Writ of Error
DANIEL ANTHONY DOTSON, M.D. AND BEVERLY ANN DOTSON, M.D.
TEXAS STATE BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/19/1981Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/16/1981Letter brief Petitioner
02/16/1981Letter brief Respondent
12/11/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
12/03/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/24/1981Response to Motion filed
03/19/1981Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/04/1981Opinion issued
02/16/1981Letter brief
02/16/1981Letter brief
01/14/1981Document received (See Remarks)
12/11/1980Response to Petition
12/03/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/03/1980Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas State Board of Medical Examiners Respondent
Daniel Anthony Dotson, M.D. and Beverly Ann Dotson, M.D.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information