judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-9,808-01
WR-9,808-01
12/11/1980
1107-HC
BONNER, CHARLES EDWARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/22/1981MISC DOCUMENT RECD
05/13/1981ACTION TAKENDirect Appeal Pending--Dismiss
05/11/1981MOTION RECEIVED
04/30/1981SUPP RECD
01/28/1981ORDER ISSUEDHC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits
12/11/1980WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/13/1981STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BONNER, CHARLESApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
12,245-12,246