judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9958
B-9958
12/10/1980
MISC PETITION
KENNETH COALSON, JERRY NOBLES, MARION HACKETT AND JOE L. ORDNER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS REPRESENTATIVES OF THE SIQNERS OF PETITIONS FOR CHARTER AMENDMENTS
CITY OF VICTORIA, CITY COUNCIL OF VICTORIA, ROBERT E. HOBBS, MAYOR AND MEMBER OF VICTORIA CITY COUNCIL, JANEY LACK, TED REED, JOHN BLACKALLER, MRS. PAT MARTIN AND INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF VICTORIA CITY COUNCIL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/22/1980Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
12/10/1980Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/31/1980Opinion issued
12/23/1980Letter Filed
12/22/1980Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/16/1980Motion for leave to file brief
12/15/1980Motion to dismiss
12/10/1980Brief in Support of Petition
12/10/1980Motion to ExpediteFiling granted
12/10/1980Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kenneth Coalson, Jerry Nobles, Marion Hackett and Joe L. Ordner, individually and as Representatives of the Siqners of Petitions for Charter AmendmentsPetitioner
John Brimberry, Will Armstrong and Duane Cook, et al.Amicus Curiae
City of Victoria, City Council of Victoria, Robert E. Hobbs, Mayor and Member of Victoria City Council, Janey Lack, Ted Reed, John Blackaller, Mrs. Pat Martin and Individual Members of Victoria City CouncilRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information