judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

R. B. BARBEE v. BILL (WILLIAM) BUCKNER, ET AL.

Case: A-4649
A-4649
04/19/1954
Application for Writ of Error
R. B. BARBEE
BILL (WILLIAM) BUCKNER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/06/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/24/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/26/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/26/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/06/1954Brief in Support of Petition
06/24/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/26/1954Brief in Support of Petition
05/04/1954Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed
04/26/1954Response to Petition
04/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bill (William) Buckner, et al.Respondent
R. B. BarbeePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information