judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAMPARTS VS. MCCLURE

Case Information: 38326
Short Caption:RAMPARTS VS. MCCLURECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A386247Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/27/2001 / Delanoy, DrakeSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/10/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Troy Everett Peyton--check no. 1761.
08/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13954
08/27/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Drake Delanoy. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/27/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 17, 18, 19, and 20, 2001. To Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 01-14494
09/04/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14834
09/06/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Drake Delanoy.
10/15/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 1, 2001. 01-17376
11/05/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-18451
11/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Court Reporter Joy Hinck shall have 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcripts requested by appellant pursuant to the transcript request filed on August 27, 2001. Appellant: 100 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-19258
12/18/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/17/01; 4/18/01; 4/19/01; 4/20/01. Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 01-21340
02/08/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 22, 2002. 02-02562
03/21/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 03/20/02. Signed by: Troy E. Peyton. 02-05040
03/21/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-05042
04/18/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 20, 2002. 02-06917
05/16/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request) 02-08666
05/17/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed May 16, 2002. Respondent shall file and serve the answering brief by June 19, 2002. 02-08728
06/19/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 06/18/02. 02-10616
07/16/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 15, 2002. 02-12166
08/09/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 08/08/02. 02-13621
03/10/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 03-03919
03/10/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
04/08/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[Luxor also contends that McClure's reference to an inadmissible incident report warrants reversal. We have considered Luxor's arguments and find them to be without merit.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-05897
05/06/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-06258
05/06/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/14/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2003. 03-06258