judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANNETTE HOLLOMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0051
Short Caption:ANNETTE HOLLOMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-13438-09Filed Date:01/14/2011

Opening Event Date:01/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/16/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnnette Holloman Y
James W. KleinNY
Fleming TerrellNY
Alice WangNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
03/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (179 pgs/Shelton) 10/26/10 proc.
03/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (180-386 pgs/Shelton) 10/27/10 proc.
03/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (387-466 pgs/Shelton) 10/28/10 proc.
03/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (11 pgs/tape) 1/10/1 proc.
03/08/2011RECORD COPIES
03/08/2011RECORD INDEX
03/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/24/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 90 days no oppo
05/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 1, 2011. (JAC)
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 10/31/11.
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 1/30/12.
01/30/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)Granted
02/01/2012FiledTMC//APPELLANT'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO DISMISS
02/23/2012FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS
02/23/2012FiledDismissed
03/16/2012FiledMandate