judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00613-CR
14-81-00613-CR
12/02/1980
Other Felony
Gentsch, James Frederick
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/05/1983Mandate Issued
06/02/1983No description available.
05/05/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/28/1983Case ready to be set
09/09/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/29/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/08/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/04/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
08/12/1981AM CUR, OTHER,
12/02/1980Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/05/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
313,459
Life