judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9941
B-9941
12/02/1980
Application for Writ of Error
NOVILENE DEATHERAGE
INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/09/1981Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/02/1981Brief on the MeritsRespondent
02/23/1981Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/16/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
12/02/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/13/1981Response to Motion filed
04/09/1981Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/25/1981Opinion issued
03/02/1981Brief on the Merits
02/23/1981Brief on the Merits
12/16/1980Response to Petition
12/02/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/02/1980Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Novilene DeatheragePetitioner
International Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information