judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VIRGIL EUGENE JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0137
Short Caption:VIRGIL EUGENE JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead:11-CM-0137Consolidated: 11-CF-0522
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD16463-09Filed Date:02/04/2011

Opening Event Date:02/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/30/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/25/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVirgil Eugene Johnson Y
Lisa D. ChanelYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John P. Gidez YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Lisa Chanel, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/17/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Lisa Chanel, Esquire
03/18/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
05/12/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 11-CM-137 and 11-CF-522 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Murray Kamionski, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 11-CF-522. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant in appeal no. 11-CF-522 shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to appeal no. 11-CF-522 have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for appeal no. 11-CF-522 have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
06/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (118pgs/Janifer) 1/13-14/11 proc.
06/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (117pgs/White) 1/18/11 proc.
06/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (200pgs/White) 1/19/11 proc.
06/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (102pgs/White) 1/20/11 proc.
06/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (59pgs/Armstrong) 1/24-25/11 proc. w/cd
06/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/13/2011RECORD INDEX (11CM137)
06/13/2011RECORD COPIES (11CM137)
06/24/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 12, 2011, directing counsel for appellant Maurice D. Calloway to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant Calloway shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
07/20/2011FiledReceived - June 24/11 order to Murray Kamionski, Esquire, (appellant Calloway,) returned by post office "person not at this address". Obtained new address and remailed order and set new dates. (Appellant)
07/29/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - statement re transcript (Appellant)Granted
08/25/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript for appeal no. 11-CF-522 and directing briefing
08/25/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/25/2011Filed(Appellant) statement regarding transcript (11-CF-522)dfe
10/05/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (11cm137) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until November 7, 2011 (11-CF-522) (Appellant)Granted
10/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellants' motions for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix
10/19/2011FiledBrief w/ appendix attached (Appellant) (11-cm-137)dfe
10/19/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant) (11-CM-137)dfe
11/07/2011FiledBrief (Appellant) (11-CF-522) (no appdx)
11/16/2011FiledMotion for leave to file the lodged limited appendix for appeal no. 11-CF-522Granted
11/17/2011FiledMotion for interim voucher on behalf of counsel for Johnson (Appellant)Denied as Moot
11/30/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's in appeal no. 11-CF-522 Motion For Leave to file the lodged limited appendix and directing the BE in 30 days from the date of this order
11/30/2011FiledAppendix for appeal no. 11-CF-522 (Appellant)
12/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/30/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/10/2012FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-522)
01/10/2012FiledRecord Index (11-CF-522)
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/09/2012FiledORDER DENYING PERMISSION TO FILE INTERIM VOUCHERS (11CM137) as moot.
02/14/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/22/2012FiledArgued Before Blackburne-Rigsby,Beckwith,King Lisa D. Chanel Esq., for appellant Virgil Eugene Johnson Murray Kamionski Esq.,for appellant Maurice D. Calloway, John P.Gidez Esq.,for appellee.
08/16/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
08/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a petition for rehearing (Appellant-Johnson)Granted
08/23/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Johnson) (Appellant)
09/06/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant) Calloway
09/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File time to file request for a rehearing Other (Appellant) CallowayGranted
09/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellants Virgil E. Johnson and Maurice D. Calloway's motion for extensions of time to file petition for rehearing. Johnson's petition is due on or before 10/15/12 and Calloway's petition is due on or before 9/28/12.
10/22/2012FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandates forthwith.
10/25/2012FiledMandate