judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HERNANDEZ (RAUL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38334
Short Caption:HERNANDEZ (RAUL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C159539Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/26/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14012
10/17/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 7/25/01 Order Denying Motion to Set Aside Restitution Requirement. Due Date: 10 days
11/01/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on July 25, 2001. 01-18289
11/20/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38275, 38334, 38364, 38412, 38415, 38472. 01-19441
03/26/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 02-05319
03/26/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/15/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA 02-17849
11/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-17928
11/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 14, 2002. 02-17928