judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD GORDON BLOOMER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0112)
Case Number:S-09-0112Case Docketed On:06/15/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:RICHARD GORDON BLOOMER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD GORDON BLOOMER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard Gordon BloomerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2010 WY 88
Citation:233 P.3d 971

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/15/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
08/03/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/02/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/09/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham M. Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
10/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/28/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/30/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 6/29/10 by agent for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/14/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/14/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/16/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 7/15/10 by agent for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/16/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/27/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for writ of certiorari filed.Notice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
11/04/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court petition deniedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal