judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JOHN WESLEY LOWERY v. NATHANIEL BERRY, ET UX. AND BOBBIE JEAN JACKSON, A MINOR, BY NEXT FRIEND

Case: A-4634
A-4634
04/14/1954
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN WESLEY LOWERY
NATHANIEL BERRY, ET UX. AND BOBBIE JEAN JACKSON, A MINOR, BY NEXT FRIEND
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/10/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/27/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/20/1954Order from Lower Court filed
07/10/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/30/1954Opinion issued
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/27/1954Response to Petition
04/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nathaniel Berry, et ux. and Bobbie Jean Jackson, a minor, by Next FriendRespondent
John Wesley LoweryPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information