judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00551-CR
01-82-00551-CR
07/16/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Stell, Jerry Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/30/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/26/1984Higher court decisionDismissed
03/28/1984No description available.Grant motion
12/09/1983No description available.
11/10/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/21/1983Submitted
08/25/1983Submission
07/20/1983Brief filed
06/20/1983Brief filed
05/26/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/13/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/29/1983Statement of facts filed
04/07/1983Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
03/30/1983Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
02/03/1983Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
01/25/1983Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
12/16/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
12/03/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/28/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/28/1982Motion to supplement the reporter's record disposed.Grant motion
10/21/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/18/1982Record filed
10/03/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/30/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
342,409
life