judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00534-CR
01-82-00534-CR
07/19/1982
Marijuana Possession
Morris, Charles E.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/08/1988Mandate received from CCA or Supreme Court
03/23/1988Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
04/30/1986Higher court decisionReversed and Dismissed
06/06/1984No description available.Refused
06/06/1984No description available.Grant motion
01/31/1984Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
01/27/1984No description available.
12/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/23/1983Submitted
10/28/1983Submission
06/21/1983Brief filed
06/02/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/27/1983Brief filed
05/25/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/12/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/04/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/21/1983Order entered
02/03/1983Order entered
10/18/1982Record filed
07/19/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/08/1988Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantLuis F. Suarez
StateCriminal - State of TexasHon. James C. Brough
StateCriminal - AppellantAllen C. Isbell
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
Honorable JOSEPH GUARINO
350,887
y years