judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00857-CR
05-82-00857-CR
07/20/1982
Violation of Securities Act
Michael Huett
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
11/06/1984Mandate Issued
11/05/1984Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/19/1984Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
06/11/1984Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
05/21/1984Case forwarded to higher court
05/18/1984Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
04/18/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/05/1984Brief Filed
01/05/1984MattConv
01/03/1984Submitted
12/30/1983Letter issued by the court
12/23/1983MattConvMotion or Writ Denied
11/30/1983MattConv
10/17/1983Brief Filed
09/21/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/16/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/22/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/22/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/17/1983Brief Filed
06/06/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/06/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/06/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/31/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/02/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/31/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/04/1983Clerks record filed
01/04/1983Reporters record filed
09/13/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/20/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/06/1984Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Huett, MichaelCriminal - Appellant
The State of TexasCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 283rd District Court
F82-75060-LIT
10 Yrs TDC & $5000 Fine