judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARC A. SHEPPARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0034
Short Caption:MARC A. SHEPPARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1238-10Filed Date:01/11/2011

Opening Event Date:01/11/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarc A. Sheppard YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/02/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED as to the 7/30/10 OR the 11/24/10 Judgments. See DC App. R. 4 (b)(1). (BY: ETW)
02/02/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
02/16/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 2/2/11 (USAO served with a copy)
02/25/2011 ORDERED that this appeal is hereby DISMISSED as untimely filed...It is FURTHER ORDERED taht the Clerk shall transmit a copy of appellant's response to the show cause order to Superior Court to ve filed as a DC Code 23-110 motion... (FIKGST) (rm)
02/25/2011DISMISSED
03/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED
04/19/2011RECEIVED - Preliminary Package from ACO - no action needed (not a new appeal) trial court proceedings pending pursuant to D.C. Code Sec. 23-110