judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOVAN DOVANTE PRESBURY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0111)
Case Number:S-09-0111Case Docketed On:06/11/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JOVAN DOVANTE PRESBURY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOVAN DOVANTE PRESBURY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJovan Dovante PresburyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2010 WY 32
Citation:226 P.3d 886

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/11/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/11/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/23/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/21/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/28/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/14/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/16/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/06/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/22/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/26/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for by agent for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
04/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/07/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/07/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/09/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 4/8/2010 for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
04/12/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/9/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal