Case Information: 38333 | |||
Short Caption: | HARRIS (RANDY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 38000 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C168459 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/14/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/17/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
08/17/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-14010 | |
10/23/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38065/38267/38293/38311/38333/38359. | 01-17803 | |
12/14/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 01-21076 | |
12/14/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/15/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-08518 | |
06/11/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-08622 | |
06/11/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/22/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2002. | 02-08622 |