judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00567-CR
01-82-00567-CR
07/20/1982
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Richardson, Freddie Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/18/1983Submitted
05/17/1983Record filed
04/19/1983Submission
03/24/1983Brief filed
02/22/1983Brief filed
02/10/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/02/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/07/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/30/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
08/19/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
08/09/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/20/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/07/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
350717
99 years