judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00533-CV
01-82-00533-CV
07/20/1982
Divorce
Atlas, Clare
Atlas, Joe
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/01/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/27/1983Opinion issuedDismissed for want of jurisdiction
01/05/1983Motion to dismiss appeal
09/09/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
08/26/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
08/12/1982Motion to extend time to file transcript dispGrant motion
08/12/1982Transcript filed
07/20/1982Motion to extend time to file transcript
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/01/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
1,132,129