judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9043
C-9043
09/11/1989
Second App Writ Error
CHARLES BEN HOWELL
OSCAR MAUZY ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/15/1989Brief on the MeritsPetitionerBRIEF RETURNED TO PET WITHOUT ACTION
11/03/1989Motion for RehearingPetitionerRULE 5 ENVELOPE ATTACHED
10/06/1989Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerIN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO RECUSE
09/11/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#2: OSCAR MAUZY ET AL
09/11/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#1: CHARLES BEN HOWELL
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/02/1990U.S. Supreme Court noticeWRIT OF CERTIORARI DENIED
03/13/1990U.S. Supreme Court noticeWRIT OF CERTIORARI FILED.
02/28/1990Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See RemarksIN RESPONSE TO INQUIRY BY FAX
11/21/1989Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See RemarksRETURNING BRIEF OF 11/15/89
11/15/1989Brief on the MeritsBRIEF RETURNED TO PET WITHOUT ACTION
11/08/1989Motion for Rehearing - Disposedmotion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sit(J. MAUZY & HECHT NOT SITTING.)
11/08/1989Record returned to Court of Appeals
11/03/1989Motion for RehearingRULE 5 ENVELOPE ATTACHED
11/03/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
10/18/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#2 - MAUZY ET AL. (J. HECHT & MAUZY N/S)
10/18/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#1 - HOWELL(J. HECHT & MAUZY NS)
10/18/1989Motion to Recuse disposedOverruledMO FOR DISQUALIFICATION OR RECUSAL OF CERTAIN JUSTICES
10/16/1989Request for recusal certified to Court - Rule 15PER RULE 15, T.R.A.P./J.GONZALEZ
10/16/1989Request for recusal certified to Court - Rule 15PER RULE 15, T.R.A.P./J.COOK
10/16/1989Request for recusal certified to Court - Rule 15PER RULE 15, T.R.A.P./J.HIGHTOWER
10/16/1989Request for recusal certified to Court - Rule 15PER RULE 15, T.R.A.P./C.J.PHILLIPS
10/16/1989Request for recusal certified to Court - Rule 15PER RULE 15, T.R.A.P./J.DOGGETT
10/16/1989Request for recusal certified to Court - Rule 15PER RULE 15, T.R.A.P./J.RAY
10/16/1989Request for recusal certified to Court - Rule 15PER RULE 15, T.R.A.P./J.SPEARS
10/06/1989Exhibits in case/cause filedIN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO RECUSE
10/06/1989Motion to Recuse filedAND BRIEF IN SUPPORT
09/28/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/28/1989No description available.
09/11/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#1: CHARLES BEN HOWELL
09/11/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#2: OSCAR MAUZY ET AL
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/09/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00181-CV
Dismissed WOJ
774 SW2d 274, 05-31-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable JOHN POWERS
Trial Court Information
353rd District Court
Travis
Honorable Harley Clark
406,958