judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00239-CV
02-89-00239-CV
09/29/1989
Mandamus
Tarpley, Wesley Joe
213th District Court of Tarrant County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989Case stored
10/25/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/25/1989Motion DisposedDismissed
10/25/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/1989Motion Filed
10/24/1989No Description Available.
10/23/1989Letter
10/12/1989Response Filed
10/05/1989Letter
09/29/1989Motion to File
09/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/10/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable George S. Kredell
0364854D