judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00240-CV
02-89-00240-CV
09/29/1989
Contract
Saylor Construction Company, Inc., and Randy Saylor
Lane, Maria
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/26/1991Mandate Issued
01/02/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/10/1990Submitted
04/10/1990Submission
04/05/1990Order Entered
12/29/1989Brief Filed
12/29/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/28/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/29/1989Brief Filed
11/01/1989Submission
10/30/1989No Description Available.
10/30/1989No Description Available.
09/29/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/26/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Saylor Construction Co.,inc.AppellantMichael L. Langley
Lane, MariaAppelleeJ. C. Bailey, Iii
Saylor, RandyAppellantMichael L. Langley
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable R. Brent Keis
89-31863-1