judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01164-CV
05-89-01164-CV
09/29/1989
Mandamus
Simpson, Nell, et al
Adolph Canales, Judge, 298th District Court, Dallas County,T
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
11/18/1997Record RetentionDestroy
11/18/1997Record RetentionDestroy
10/17/1989Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/13/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/04/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/04/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/29/1989MattConv
09/29/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
298th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Adolph P Canales
88-16085-M