judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00312-CV
07-89-00312-CV
09/29/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Griego, Joe I.
Dodson, J. R.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/13/1991Mandate Issued
04/25/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
10/16/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/08/1990Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc.
09/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/14/1990Letter of Inquiry filed
11/22/1989Brief Filed
11/22/1989Case ready to be set
10/30/1989Brief Filed
10/17/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
10/04/1989Do not use
10/04/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/02/1989Do not use
09/29/1989Do not use
09/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/13/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Griego, Joe I.AppellantDavid Martinez
Dodson, J. R.AppelleeErnest R. Reeves
Trial Court Information
County Court
Randall
Honorable Darrell R Carey
L-1182