judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REESE (KEITH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38311
Short Caption:REESE (KEITH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C169470Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/24/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13767
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38065/38267/38293/38311/38333/38359. 01-17802
12/24/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-21672
12/24/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/01/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-03766
03/26/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-03913
03/26/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 26, 2002. 02-03913