judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1246-89
PD-1246-89
09/11/1989
PDR Case Type
BOULOS, PHILLIPPE RIAD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/24/1990FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
01/24/1990REHEAR DISPDENIED
12/27/1989REHEAR FILED
12/13/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/12/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/11/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/26/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BOULOS, PHILLIPPE RIADApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Steve Hebert
William A. Tillman
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
01-88-00939-CR
Rev & Dism 5-11-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
Honorable JIMMY JAMES
498516