judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00973-CV
01-89-00973-CV
09/29/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Shaw, Paul Keith
Shaw, Judy Elizabeth
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/03/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/26/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
05/11/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
04/26/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
04/26/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
02/15/1990Notice of dismissal
01/11/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/28/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/01/1989Statement of facts filed
11/16/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
11/02/1989Motion for leave to file strans
10/12/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/02/1989Transcript filed
09/29/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantHon. Candace Sturdivant
StateAppellantHon. David A. Gibson
StateAppelleeMarshall Davis Brown Jr.
Trial Court Information
257th District Court
Harris
82-62440