judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCOVILLE (JEFFREY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38312
Short Caption:SCOVILLE (JEFFREY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40721
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR2529Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/14/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/14/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-13816
08/14/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-13817
08/16/2001ExhibitFiled Exhibit (original). Certified copy of exhibit list from Nye County Clerk. 01-13988
09/18/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15785
09/18/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-15786
10/08/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: October 15, 2001. 01-16868
10/17/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-17541
10/17/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-17542
12/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the district court's sentence was not based solely on the number of appellant's previous convictions for DUI. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they are without merit, we 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-20440
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20771
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 4, 2002. 01-20771