judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES F. DAVIDSON, JR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0033
Short Caption:JAMES F. DAVIDSON, JR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-10580-08Filed Date:01/11/2011

Opening Event Date:01/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/14/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/20/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/17/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/14/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames F. Davidson, Jr.YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elana SuttenbergYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/27/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David Reiter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to January 11, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/27/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David Reiter, Esquire
03/03/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 27, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
03/07/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (unopposed)
03/07/2011RECEIVED - Statement Regarding Transcript (attached to MOLV)
03/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
03/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (no transcript needed)
05/14/2012FiledRecord Copies
05/14/2012FiledRecord Index
05/14/2012FiledRecord Completed
05/15/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (U.S. opposition to defendant's motion to vacate sentence under 23 DC Code 110 - filed 4/14/10) **SEALED**
05/22/2012FiledBriefing Order
05/30/2012FiledLetter From appellant regarding his case. (Appellant)
06/14/2012FiledLetter To David Reiter, Esq. re: letter from client
06/29/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
06/29/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
07/30/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record on Appeal under Seal (Appellee)
07/30/2012FiledMotion to file its brief under seal (Appellee)Granted
08/06/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE LODGED BRIEF UNDER SEAL//MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD UNDER SEAL
08/20/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION TO SUPP the RECORD and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE ATTACHED EXHIBITS AS A SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD and APPELLEE'S MOTION TO FILE the BRIEF IS GRANTED and the CLERK SHALL FILE APPELLEE'S LODGED BRIEF UNDER SEAL and file APPELLANT'S LODGED REPLY BRIEF
08/20/2012FiledSupplemental Record #2 (***************SEALED)
08/20/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)*************************SEALED
08/20/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/20/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/03/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/17/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Fisher, Beckwith
12/21/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman, Fisher, and Beckwith, Associates Judges.)
01/02/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
01/14/2013FiledMandate